+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 135/2 - from Ch. 134, par. 16.5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor