+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 036-067-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
- Reported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 006-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2019: HB2569 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB2569 - Job Growth, Preservation and Traini
March 27, 2019: HB2569 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor