+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (76)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0871
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 117-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 117-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4, 5
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John M. Cabello
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John M. Cabello
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 012-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Karen McConnaughay
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-002-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
Senate Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the engrossed bill with the following changes. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if the defendant pleads guilty the plea shall not be accepted until the court shall have fully explained to the defendant the sentence for any future conviction may be increased or there may be a higher possibility of the imposition of consecutive sentences (rather than any possible increased sentence by reason of the fact of a prior conviction or future conviction and any possibility of the imposition of consecutive sentences); that as a consequence of a conviction or a plea of guilty, there may be registration requirements that restrict where the defendant may work, live, or be present (rather than any registration requirement that accompanies the plea and the restrictions associated with the registration); and that as a consequence of a conviction or a plea of guilty, there may be an impact upon the defendant's ability to, among others: retain or obtain housing in the public or private market; retain or obtain employment; and retain or obtain a firearm, an occupational license, a driver's license (rather than the consequence of the plea on a defendant's ability to). Deletes the requirements that a defendant who pleads guilty shall have the court explain the consequences of the plea on the defendant's ability to acquire loans for education or other purposes, enroll in certain degree programs, and retain or obtain custody of a child.
Senate Amendment 004
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the engrossed bill with the following changes. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Deletes the requirements that a defendant who pleads guilty shall have the court explain the consequences of the plea on the defendant's ability to acquire loans for education or other purposes, enroll in certain degree programs, and retain or obtain custody of a child.
House Amendment 001
Makes a technical correction.
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/113-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 113-4