+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0254
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-033-000
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that an alleged delinquent minor under 13 years of age shall not be admitted, kept, or detained in a detention facility unless a local youth service provider, including a provider through the Comprehensive Community Based Youth Services network, has been contacted and has not been able to accept the minor.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2015: HB2567 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 21, 2015
April 29, 2015: HB2567 - Criminal Law - Apr 29, 2015
April 15, 2015: HB2567 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 15, 2015
March 24, 2015: HB2567 - Juvenile Justice & System-Involved - Mar 24, 2015
March 24, 2015: HCA0001 - Juvenile Justice & System-Involved - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor