+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor