+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45 - from Ch. 127, par. 1005-45
- 5 ILCS 430/5-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/5-10.10 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/5-70 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/50-5 -
- 5 ILCS 430/70-5 -
- 15 ILCS 305/14 -
- 25 ILCS 170/4.8 new -
- 25 ILCS 170/5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/10 - from Ch. 63, par. 180
- 775 ILCS 5/2-108 new -
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor