+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 750 ILCS 60/214 - from Ch. 40, par. 2312-14
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor