+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- To Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor