+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-017-013
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 013-001-002
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah L. Graham
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 19, 2003: HB2533 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor