+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 012-000-000
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013
- Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Requires the labeling of each donation bin (rather than each clothing donation bin) located in a county or municipality. Requires all entities to label their donation bins with the words "for profit" or "not for profit". Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 18, 2013: HB2530 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 18, 2013
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor