+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 5, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0413
- Effective Date August 5, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB2526 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
April 3, 2003: HB2526 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor