+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
March 14, 2019: HB2525 - Counties & Townships
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor