+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 24, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0336
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 relating to domestic battery. Makes the same changes as the bill but makes grammatical changes.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-3.2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-3.2
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB2525 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 18, 2003: HB2525 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 18, 2003
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor