+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Changes the effective date from immediate to January 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2021: HB2523 - Third Reading
April 21, 2021: HFA0002 - Personnel & Pensions
March 19, 2021: HB2523 - Personnel & Pensions
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor