+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 018-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert F. Flider
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks