+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-001-000
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Requires the Board of Higher Education to establish and maintain an Internet-based system to assist students, families, and others seeking information concerning the legitimacy of degree programs and degree-credit courses that are offered over the Internet. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -