+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-008-006
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 014-000-001
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Terry R. Parke; as amended
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces the title and everything after the enacting clause with provisions similar to House Bill 3561 as introduced. Deletes participation by self-employed individuals. Provides for participation by a small business having fewer that 50, rather than 25, employees. Specifically allows for payment for coverage by the employees. Provides that employees that have other coverage do not have to enroll in the coverage. Authorizes the use of State funds, pursuant to appropriation, in operating the plan. Provides for the utilization of insurance producers in the marketing of the plans. Effective January 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/351B-1 - from Ch. 73, par. 963B-1
+ − Vote
April 4, 2003: HB2514 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2003
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor