+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 11, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0280
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/11-21 - from Ch. 38, par. 11-21