+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 550/1 - from Ch. 29, par. 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor