+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0257
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 1205/2-25 - from Ch. 105, par. 2-25
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2019: HB2499 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB2499 - Local Government
March 27, 2019: HB2499 - Third Reading
March 5, 2019: HB2499 - Cities & Villages
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor