+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed revised
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-167.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-167.1
- 40 ILCS 5/5-167.2 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-167.2
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor