+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2003
- Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-033-004
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 020-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Local Government Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Local Government Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Southwest Suburban Railroad Development Authority shall embrace the townships of Bloom, Thornton, Calumet, Bremen, Orland, Worth, and Palos (instead of certain municipalities). Reduces the size of the governing board from 28 members to 5 members. Provides that those members shall be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate. Makes other changes.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 20, 2003: HB2492 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor