+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-002
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 011-002-001
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.25d - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.25d
+ − Vote
March 21, 2003: HB2491 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor