+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the participation must be in the organization of a blood drive or other blood donor recruitment campaign.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-22.3 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-22.3
+ − Vote
March 27, 2003: HB2490 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor