+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor