+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 003-002-001
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/10-17 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-17
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: HFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
March 27, 2019: HB2485 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
March 6, 2019: HB2485 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor