+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/101 - from Ch. 120, par. 1-101