+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 019-000-000
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor