+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 13, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0395
- Effective Date August 13, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes a reference of "physicians" to "physicians licensed to practice medicine in all its branches". Provides that a healthcare provider shall obtain the written informed consent (instead of informed consent) of a patient to the disclosure of the patient's information. Provides that no duty to report under the Act exists if the patient's legal representative refuses written informed consent to report.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2009: HB2481 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 19, 2009
March 18, 2009: HB2481 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 18, 2009
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor