+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 23, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0317
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-4-1