+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor