+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank Aguilar
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John J. Millner
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/111-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 111-3