+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0025
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 21, 2019
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-001
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-003-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the bill as introduced and expands the scope to apply to services as well as products that cause or contribute to injuries. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 815 ILCS 505/10b - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 270b