+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Roger L. Eddy; As Amended by HA 1
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Roger L. Eddy; As Amended
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On March 14, 2005 in the House:
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black; As Amended
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 003-002-000
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Delgado
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard T. Bradley
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as introduced with the following changes. In provisions concerning the State contribution to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago from the Common School Fund or other State funds, provides that the amount shall be not less than the greater of (i) the amount appropriated for the Fund for the State fiscal year ending in calendar year 2003 (was, 2004) or (ii) the minimum funding requirement for that fiscal year. Removes references to certain additional employer contributions in the definition of "minimum funding requirement" and makes conforming changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/17-127 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-127
- 40 ILCS 5/17-129 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-129
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor