+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 009-000-003
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that retail tobacco stores shall annually file with the Department of Public Health by January 31st an affidavit stating the percentage of its gross revenue (instead of income) during the prior calendar year that was derived from the sale of loose tobacco, plants, or herbs and cigars, cigarettes, pipes, or other smoking devices for smoking tobacco and related smoking accessories.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor