+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0227
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2020
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 013-002-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-042-000
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Morrison
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Morrison
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-007-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.155 -
- 105 ILCS 5/27-21 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-21
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: HB0246 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB0246 - Education
March 13, 2019: HB0246 - Third Reading
February 6, 2019: HB0246 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor