+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-008-015
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and inserts similar provisions, with these changes: changes the short title to the Apprentice/Training Equity Act; replaces references to apprentices with "apprentices/trainees" and references to apprenticeship with "apprenticeship/training"; provides that the Act applies to construction contracts funded in whole with State funds (rather than State construction contracts); and adds and changes provisions concerning contents of plans under the Act, waivers of plan requirements, sanctions, subcontractors, reimbursement, definitions, and other matters. Effective January 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -