+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor