+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 9(b); May 2, 2003
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 018-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lovana Jones
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces the title and everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Makes technical changes in a Section concerning the short title.
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 205 ILCS 670/1.5 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/8.2 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/15d - from Ch. 17, par. 5419
- 205 ILCS 670/17.1 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/17.2 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/17.3 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/17.4 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/17.5 new -
- 205 ILCS 670/22.1 new -
- 720 ILCS 5/17-1a - from Ch. 38, par. 17-1a