+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 11, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0279
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Transportation; 006-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard P. Myers