+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0007
- Effective Date July 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-008-000
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2017: HB2442 - Third Reading
May 2, 2017: HB2442 - Education
March 15, 2017: HB2442 - Third Reading
March 8, 2017: HB2442 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor