+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- To Commercial Law Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers