+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-002-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers