+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor