+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0413
- Effective Date August 16, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013
- Do Pass Education; 014-000-000
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-038-001
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/21-25 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-25
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-25 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: HB2420 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 22, 2013
April 16, 2013: HB2420 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 16, 2013
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor