+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 10, 2017
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Provides that "places a person under surveillance" includes tracking the person through any similar available electronic means. Deletes the amendatory changes to the aggravated stalking statute.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 5/12-7.3 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-7.3
- 720 ILCS 5/12-7.4 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-7.4
- 720 ILCS 5/12-7.4 -
+ − Votes (5)
May 13, 2015: HB0242 - Criminal Law - May 13, 2015
April 21, 2015: HB0242 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 21, 2015
March 24, 2015: HB0242 - Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal - Mar 24, 2015
March 24, 2015: HB0242 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 24, 2015
March 24, 2015: HCA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor