+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/11-4.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 11-4.1