+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor