+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mike Bost
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mike Bost
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Insurance Committee; 015-011-000
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 013-012-000
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 10, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 215 ILCS 5/351B-4 - from Ch. 73, par. 963B-4
- 215 ILCS 5/364 - from Ch. 73, par. 976
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor