+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Gaming Committee; 021-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Gaming Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Gaming Committee
- Assigned to Gaming Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
In provisions of the Riverboat Gambling Act concerning the powers and duties of the Illinois Gaming Board, (i) reinserts provisions concerning appointment of investigators with the following changes: adds that the appointment power is "as deemed necessary by the Board" and removes language requiring the Board to issue each investigator a badge and (ii) adds provisions allowing the Board to contract with the Department of State Police and the Department of Revenue for the use of trained and qualified personnel to conduct investigations, searches, seizures, arrests, and other duties imposed under the Act (and allows for appropriations to the Department of Revenue for this purpose). Changes the effective date to July 1, 2007 (was, effective immediately).
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 15 ILCS 15/3.1 - from Ch. 127, par. 1803.1
- 20 ILCS 2505/2505-305 - was 20 ILCS 2505/39b15.1
- 40 ILCS 5/14-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-110
- 230 ILCS 10/4 - from Ch. 120, par. 2404
- 230 ILCS 10/5 - from Ch. 120, par. 2405
- 230 ILCS 10/5.2 new -
- 230 ILCS 10/13 - from Ch. 120, par. 2413